+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Law 228
- Signed by the Governor
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate;
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House;
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Head, Taylor, Buck and Alting
- Senate Conferees appointed: Boots and Broden
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees appointed: Negele and Pryor
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: Mahan, Truitt, Sullivan, Aylesworth, Thompson, Riecken and Errington
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Bartlett added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Thompson) motion withdrawn voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Truitt) prevailed; voice vote
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Truitt added as cosponsor
- Representative Negele added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Broden added as coauthor
- Amendment #2 (Broden) failed;
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Smith added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as third author
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senators Boots and Head