+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Delph added as coauthor
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 142: yeas 17, nays 31
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Bohacek added as second author
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
- Authored by Senator Walker