+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Bauer added as cosponsor
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Becker and Bohacek added as coauthors
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Richardson and Judy
- House sponsor: Representative Smith M
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 140: yeas 42, nays 6
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Alting added as coauthor
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 77: yeas 10, nays 39
- Amendment #3 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 76: yeas 9, nays 40
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
- Senator Ruckelshaus added as third author
- Senator Head added as second author
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
- Authored by Senator Walker
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor