+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 232: yeas 100, nays 0
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Bacon added as cosponsor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 50, nays 0
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Representative Truitt added as sponsor
- Representatives Clere and Wright added as cosponsors
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as second author
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family & Children Services
- Authored by Senator Messmer