+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Thompson, Barrett, Campbell and Harris
- House conferees appointed: Huston and Porter
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Houchin and Tallian
- Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Taylor G
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Porter added as cosponsor
- Representative Lehman removed as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 437: yeas 94, nays 0
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Lehman, Leonard and Mahan
- House sponsor: Representative Huston
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 40, nays 0
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Houchin added as second author
- Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Holdman
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor