+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Rhoads added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment #2 (Smith J) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Kenley added as second author
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Smith J
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor