+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators Delph, Randolph, Young M, Zakas added as coauthors
- Senator Crane added as coauthor
- Senators Koch and Smith added as coauthors
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Olthoff, Wright and Lawson
- House sponsor: Representative McNamara
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 26: yeas 43, nays 4
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Becker) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Grooms added as third author
- Senator Hershman added as second author
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Authored by Senator Becker
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor