+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Law 110
- Signed by the Governor
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 450: yeas 48, nays 0
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 338: yeas 88, nays 0
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Shackleford) prevailed; Roll Call 314: yeas 93, nays 1
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Moed added as cosponsor
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Representative Brown, T.
- House sponsor: Representative VanNatter
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 130: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #2 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as coauthor
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Lanane added as third author
- Senator Holdman added as second author
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
- Authored by Senator Hershman