+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Law 27
- Signed by the Governor
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 256: yeas 93 and nays 2
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Moed added as cosponsor.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Natural Resources
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative Eberhart added as sponsor.
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 111: yeas 48 and nays 0
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: engrossed
- Senator Skinner added as coauthor.
- Senator Head added as second author.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Authored by Senator Merritt.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor