+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Law 100
- Signed by the Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 334: yeas 44, nays 0
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 96, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Baird removed as sponsor
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Representative Brown, T. removed as cosponsor
- Representative Brown, T. added as sponsor
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Glick added as coauthor
- Cosponsors: Representatives Brown, T. and Bartlett
- House sponsor: Representative Baird
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 148: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Hershman added as third author
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Holdman added as second author
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Kenley