+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Law 141
- Signed by the Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 369: yeas 50, nays 0
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 401: yeas 93, nays 1
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: Truitt, Thompson and Errington
- House Conferees appointed: Huston and Goodin
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Eckerty, Stoops and Raatz
- Senate Conferees appointed: Kenley and Tallian
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 329: yeas 92, nays 1
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #2 (Huston) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
- Senator Perfect added as coauthor
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Truitt and Goodin
- House sponsor: Representative Huston
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 50, nays 0
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Senator Raatz added as third author
- Amendment #3 (Eckerty) prevailed; voice vote
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Eckerty added as second author
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor
- Authored by Senator Kenley