+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 365: yeas 49, nays 0
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 363: yeas 90, nays 2
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Koch added as cosponsor
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Leising added as second author
- Representative Brown, C. added as cosponsor
- Representative Brown, T. added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Miller Patricia
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor