+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 88: yeas 34, nays 11
- House sponsor: Representative Lehman
- Cosponsor: Representative Barrett
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #4 (Charbonneau) prevailed; Roll Call 59: yeas 30, nays 17
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Messmer added as third author
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Crider, Mishler, Busch, Becker, Brown L, Leising, Breaux, Donato, Yoder, Boehnlein added as coauthors
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Holdman added as second author
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Charbonneau
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
+ − Adopted Amendments (19)
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 88
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor