+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Law 62
- Signed by the Governor
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 323: yeas 46, nays 0
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 89, nays 1
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment #2 (Morrison) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Fleming added as cosponsor
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford Jon added as second author
- Cosponsor: Representative Barrett
- House sponsor: Representative Morrison
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 46, nays 0
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Charbonneau
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 262
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 36
- Yeas: 46