+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 388: yeas 50, nays 0
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 431: yeas 97, nays 0
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: Frye R, Soliday, GiaQuinta and Bartlett
- House Conferees appointed: Baird and Macer
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Kenley added as coauthor
- Motion to dissent filed
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senate Conferees appointed: Banks and Arnold J
- Senate Advisors appointed: Hershman, Lanane and Buck
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 96, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (Baird) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Baird) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Klinker) failed; Roll Call 269: yeas 29, nays 66
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Miller, Pat added as coauthor
- Representatives Cox, GiaQuinta, Judy added as cosponsors
- Representative Baird added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 50, nays 0
- Senators Tomes and Lanane added as coauthors
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor
- Senator Alting added as coauthor
- Senator Broden added as coauthor
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Merritt added as coauthor
- Senator Arnold added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as third author
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military
- Authored by Senators Banks and Hershman
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor