+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 48
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading: passed;
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Representatives Clere and Davisson added as cosponsors
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed;
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Representative Brown, T. added as sponsor
- Representative Brown, C. added as cosponsor
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Miller Patricia) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators Grooms and Mrvan added as coauthors
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators Charbonneau and Brown L added as coauthors
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as third author
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Crider added as second author
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Miller Patricia