+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Cherry added as cosponsor.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative Washburne added as sponsor.
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 175: yeas 48 and nays 0
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Steele added as second author.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Waterman.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor