+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Law 20
- Signed by the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Moed added as cosponsor
- Representatives Jordan and Morris added as cosponsors
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 88, nays 3
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Sandlin added as third author
- House sponsor: Representative Pressel
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 47, nays 0
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Glick added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Doriot added as second author
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
- Authored by Senator Crider
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 2022: Roll Call 57
- Yeas: 47
January 24, 2022: Roll Call 239
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor