+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 121
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 455: yeas 49, nays 0
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur in House amendments filed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 386: yeas 95, nays 0
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment 1 (Moed), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Moed added as cosponsor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction
- Representative Koch added as cosponsor
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Holdman added as coauthor
- Senators Merritt, Kruse and Smith added as coauthors
- House sponsor: Rep. Turner
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 49 and nays 0
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 1 (Pete Miller), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Delph added as coauthor
- Senator Taylor added as third author
- Senator Walker added as second author
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development & Technology
- Authored by Senator Pete Miller
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2013: Roll Call No. 455
March 28, 2013: Roll Call No. 7652
February 4, 2013: Roll Call No. 61
January 28, 2013: Roll Call No. 386
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor