+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 130
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 375: yeas 94, nays 0
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 357: yeas 49, nays 1
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
- House advisors appointed: Davis, Cook, Klinker and Pfaff
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton
- Senate advisors appointed: Kruse and Qaddoura
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 82, nays 0
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 48, nays 0
- House sponsor: Representative Behning
- Cosponsor: Representative Jordan
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Raatz
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Senator Kruse added as second author
+ − Adopted Amendments (12)
+ − Proposed Amendments (23)
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 121
- Yeas: 48
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 269
- Yeas: 82