+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 243
On May 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 646: yeas 95, nays 2
- Rules suspended
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 570: yeas 41, nays 9
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Thompson, Mayfield and Bartlett
- House conferees appointed: Karickhoff and Candelaria Reardon
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Bray, R. Young and Zakas
- Senate conferee appointed: Buck and Stoops
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 451: yeas 93, nays 0
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment 4 (Thompson), prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment 3 (Karickhoff), prevailed; voice vote
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Candelaria Reardon added as cosponsor
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Reps. Mayfield and VanNatter
- House sponsor: Rep. Karickhoff
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 53: yeas 49 and nays 0
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 1 (Buck), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Crider added as third author
- Senator Bray added as second author
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
- Authored by Senator Buck
+ − Amendments (7)
Senate Amendment 0285-1
Passed
House Amendment 0285-5
Filed
Senate Amendment 0285-D
Passed
House Amendment 0285-4
Passed
House Amendment 0285-3
Passed
House Amendment 0285-2
Filed
House Amendment 0285-1
Filed