+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Zay added as coauthor
- Senator Buck added as coauthor
- House sponsor: Representative Bartels
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 49, nays 0
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Koch added as coauthor
- Senator Raatz added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Authored by Senator Houchin
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor