+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Tomes added as coauthor
- Cosponsors: Representatives Brown, T., Sullivan and Bacon
- House sponsor: Representative Clere
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 125: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as third author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Coauthored by Senator Leising
- Authored by Senators Becker and Delph
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor