+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 165
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 385: yeas 47, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 384: yeas 97, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Concurrence withdrawn
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Speedy, Frye R and Candelaria Reardon
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Koch and Niezgodski
- Senate advisors appointed: Crider, Mrvan and Buck
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Soliday and Forestal
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives McNamara and Forestal added as cosponsors
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 309: yeas 92, nays 1
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment #3 (Soliday) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (McNamara) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Frye added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 136: yeas 48, nays 0
- House sponsor: Representative Soliday
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Crider added as third author
- Senator Buck added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
- Authored by Senator Koch
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor