+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading: defeated;
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 35(c); technical correction committee report adopted deleting amendment 269-01 and substituting amendment 269-02 therefor in order to correct a clerical error
- Amendment #1 (Lanane) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Smith added as second author
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Kruse
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor