+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 17
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 90, nays 1
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Jordan added as cosponsor
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Raatz, Gaskill, Crane added as coauthors
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 49, nays 0
- House sponsor: Representative Jeter
- Cosponsor: Representative Bartels
- Senators Rogers and Kruse added as coauthors
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Buchanan added as coauthor
- Senator Pol added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senator Sandlin added as coauthor
- Senators Yoder and Breaux added as coauthors
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Perfect added as second author
- Senator Messmer added as third author
- Senators Holdman, Koch, Houchin, Zay, Doriot, Boehnlein added as coauthors
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Donato added as coauthor
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Leising added as coauthor
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Garten
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 165
- Yeas: 49
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 237
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor