+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Law 43
- Signed by the Governor
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Zent added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representatives Brown, C. and Davisson added as cosponsorss
- Senator Becker added as second author
- Representative Clere added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Miller Patricia
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor