+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Law 220
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 611: yeas 94, nays 0
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 570: yeas 49, nays 0
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Manning and Jackson
- House advisors appointed: Schaibley, Young J, Hatfield and Summers
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Head and Ford J.D.
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
- Concurrence withdrawn
- Senate advisors appointed: Young M, Breaux, Mrvan and Crane
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Jackson added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 340: yeas 96, nays 0
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #3 (Jackson) prevailed; Roll Call 334: yeas 78, nays 14
- Amendment #2 (Hatfield) prevailed; voice vote
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Schaibley added as cosponsor
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Crane added as coauthor
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Manning
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 48, nays 0
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
- Senator Young M added as third author
- Senators Randolph and Merritt added as coauthors
- Senator Lanane added as coauthor
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
- Senator Head added as second author
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
- Authored by Senator Mrvan
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor