+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Thompson
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 44, nays 6
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Crane added as coauthor
- Senator Kruse added as second author
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
- Authored by Senator Raatz
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor