+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 242
On May 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 655: yeas 92, nays 7
- Rules suspended
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 543: yeas 48, nays 2
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Gutwein, Leonard and Moseley
- House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Niezgodski
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Schneider, Skinner and Boots
- Senate conferee appointed: Walker and Tallian
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 346: yeas 79, nays 19
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment 1 (Burton), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Rep. Niezgodski
- House sponsor: Rep. Steuerwald
- Referred to the House
- Reread third time: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 37, nays 12
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as coauthor
- Third reading: call withdrawn
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Schneider added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
- Authored by Senator Walker
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment 0248-1
Passed
Senate Amendment 0248-D
Passed