+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Raatz added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Representative Carbaugh
- House sponsor: Representative DeVon
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 48, nays 1
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Amendment #2 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
- Senators Donato and Rogers added as coauthors
- Senator Spartz added as third author
- Senator Kruse added as second author
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
- Authored by Senator Brown L