+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 128
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 346: yeas 40, nays 10
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 356: yeas 88, nays 6
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Ford J.D.
- Senate advisors appointed: Boehnlein and Melton
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Zent and Fleming
- House advisors appointed: Barrett, Lehe and Shackleford
- Representative Barrett removed as advisor
- Representative Zent removed as conferee
- Representative Barrett added as conferee
- Representative Jordan added as advisor
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 271: yeas 84, nays 1
- Representative Fleming added as cosponsor
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (Zent) prevailed; voice vote
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Representatives Jordan and Barrett added as cosponsors
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Pol added as coauthor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 49, nays 0
- House sponsor: Representative Zent
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Boehnlein) prevailed; voice vote
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Brown L removed as coauthor
- Senator Brown L added as second author
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Leising, Brown L, Becker, Yoder added as coauthors
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Boehnlein
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 162
- Yeas: 49
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 271
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor