+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 199
- Signed by the Governor
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 93, nays 3
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Torr) motion withdrawn
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Cherry and Aylesworth added as cosponsors
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Representative Klinker
- House sponsor: Representative Siegrist
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Ford, Grooms, Merritt, Messmer, Sandlin, Taylor G, Lanane added as coauthors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
- Authored by Senators Alting, Tomes and Becker
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor