+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Law 90
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 357: yeas 48 and nays 1
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 335: yeas 94 and nays 0
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
- SB 220 Amendment #2 (Lehman), prevailed.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Insurance
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 43: yeas 45 and nays 0
- Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor.
- Referred to the House
- Representative Lehman added as sponsor.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor.
- Senator Mrvan added as coauthor.
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Holdman), prevailed.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Walker added as second author.
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Insurance
- Authored by Senator Holdman
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor