+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Law 165
- Signed by the Governor
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments;
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading: passed;
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representatives McNamara and Lawson added as cosponsors
- Senator Arnold added as second author
- Representative Gutwein added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Boots
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor