+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 357: yeas 49, nays 0
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
- Dissent withdrawn
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: Bacon, Davisson and Bauer
- House Conferees appointed: Kirchhofer and Shackleford
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Miller Patricia, Mrvan and Miller Pete
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hershman and Breaux
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 300: yeas 95, nays 0
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Davisson added as cosponsor
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Bacon added as cosponsor
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representative Kirchhofer added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 88: yeas 50, nays 0
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Miller, Pat added as second author
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Hershman
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor