+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Clere added as cosponsor
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as coauthor
- House sponsor: Representative Negele
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 169: yeas 45, nays 3
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Eckerty) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Niemeyer added as second author
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Eckerty