+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Delph added as third author
- Cosponsor: Representative Clere
- House sponsor: Representative Price
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 136: yeas 50, nays 0
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Bray added as second author
- Amendment #1 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
- Authored by Senator Merritt