+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 45
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 345: yeas 97, nays 0
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Summers added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Klinker added as cosponsor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Rep. Frizzell
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 49 and nays 0
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
- Senator Becker added as second author
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Leising