+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Law 1
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
- Signed by the Speaker
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 97, nays 1
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 19: yeas 27, nays 64
- Amendment #5 (Kersey) failed; Roll Call 18: yeas 27, nays 64
- Amendment #6 (Goodin) failed; Roll Call 17: yeas 27, nays 64
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as coauthor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 9: yeas 48, nays 1
- House sponsor: Representative Behning
- Senator Raatz added as coauthor
- Senators Becker, Ford, Mrvan added as coauthors
- Senator Bassler added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Representative Smith, V.
- Referred to the House
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Hershman and Yoder added as coauthors
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Charbonneau, Holdman, Leising, Rogers, Stoops added as coauthors
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Mishler added as third author
- Senator Kenley added as second author
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
- Authored by Senator Kruse
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor