+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Representative Gutwein
- House sponsor: Representative Morris
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 49, nays 0
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Young M added as second author
- Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Authored by Senator Head
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor