+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Tomes added as coauthor
- House sponsor: Representative Schaibley
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 45, nays 2
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senators Young M and Freeman added as coauthors
- Senator Walker K added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
- Senator Sandlin added as third author
- Senator Koch added as second author
- Senator Koch removed as coauthor
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Koch added as coauthor
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
- Authored by Senator Baldwin