+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Law 16
- Signed by the Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 345: yeas 48, nays 0
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Fleming added as cosponsor
- Representative Clere added as cosponsor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 310: yeas 94, nays 0
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Abbott D added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Representative Heaton
- House sponsor: Representative Morrison
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 49, nays 0
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
- Senator Grooms added as third author
- Senator Alting added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
- Authored by Senator Ford Jon