+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 93, nays 0
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 49, nays 0
- House sponsor: Representative Siegrist
- Cosponsors: Representatives Jordan, Pressel and Olthoff
- Senator Crane added as coauthor
- Senator Raatz added as coauthor
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Alting, Charbonneau, Bassler, Ford, Merritt, Tallian, Melton, Zakas, Brown L added as coauthors
- Senator Holdman added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Authored by Senator Mishler
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor