+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative Steuerwald added sponsor.
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 156: yeas 46 and nays 2
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Taylor added as coauthor.
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor.
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law
- Authored by Senator Glick
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor