+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 158
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 382: yeas 45, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 382: yeas 97, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Torr added as advisor
- House advisors appointed: Burton and Taylor J
- House conferees appointed: Morris and GiaQuinta
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Raatz and Stoops
- Senate conferees appointed: Kruse and Randolph Lonnie M
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 182: yeas 96, nays 1
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Burton and GiaQuinta
- House sponsor: Representative Morris
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Raatz added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
- Authored by Senator Kruse