+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Law 127
- Signed by the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 337: yeas 49, nays 1
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 92, nays 2
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (Wesco) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Representative Jackson added as cosponsor
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Representative Abbott D
- House sponsor: Representative Eberhart
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 48, nays 1
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Crider added as second author
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Boots, Koch, Walker K added as coauthors
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Authored by Senator Glick
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 158
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 290
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor