+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 12
- Signed by the Governor
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 92, nays 0
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment #2 (Austin) ruled out of order
- Amendment #1 (Klinker) motion withdrawn
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Taylor G added as coauthor
- Cosponsors: Representatives Judy, Morris and GiaQuinta
- House sponsor: Representative Sullivan
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
- Senator Bohacek added as third author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford added as second author
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
- Authored by Senator Zay
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor