+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 120
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 454: yeas 49, nays 0
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur in House amendments filed
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 323: yeas 91, nays 2
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Representative VanDenburgh added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Battles added as cosponsor
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Rep. Behning
- House sponsor: Rep. Karickhoff
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 50 and nays 0
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators Schneider and Taylor added as coauthors
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as second author
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
- Authored by Senator Banks
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 0182-C
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2013: Roll Call No. 454
March 25, 2013: Roll Call No. 323
March 19, 2013: Roll Call No. 7966
February 26, 2013: Roll Call No. 207
February 21, 2013: Roll Call No. 7811
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor