+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 11
- Signed by the Governor
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 93, nays 0
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Stemler added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Thompson and Goodin
- House sponsor: Representative Engleman
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 102: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
- Authored by Senator Grooms